IL SB3126 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Registered Neurodiagnostic Technologist Title Protection Act. Provides for registration of neurodiagnostic technologist by the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation. Prohibits a person from holding himself or herself out as a registered neurodiagnostic technologist without being registered by the Department. Establishes qualifications for registration as a neurodiagnostic technologist. Establishes the powers and duties of the Department, including prescribing fees for initial application and renewal of the registration, setting expiration and renewal period of the registration, defining the criteria for registration, investigating alleged violations of the Act, conducting hearings on disciplinary and other matters. Provides for grounds for disciplinary action. Provides for civil and criminal penalties for violations of this Act. Creates provisions concerning formal hearings, including record of proceedings, appointment of hearing officers, subpoenas and depositions, and rehearings. Provides for judicial review of all final administrative decisions of the Department. Preempts home rule. Effective January 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NEURODIAGNOSTIC TECHNOLOGIST

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2018-07-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2018-05-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018
2018-05-08SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-08SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 007-002-000
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5804.39New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback