IL SB3125 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-21 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Horse Racing Act of 1975. Requires the Illinois Racing Board to adopt rules authorizing sports wagering by organization licensees and inter-track wagering location licensees. Makes conforming changes in the Criminal Code of 2012. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RACING BOARD-SPORTS WAGERING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2018-04-27SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Gaming
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. William E. Brady

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
23059Amended CodeCitation Text
720528-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback