IL SB3124 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-11-15 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Public Utilities Act. Requires the Illinois Commerce Commission to issue a report evaluating the degree to which rate structures can create incentives for economic development in the State. Provides for repeal of the provisions on January 1, 2020. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ICC-REPORT-RATE STRUCTURES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-15SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2018-04-13SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Energy and Public Utilities
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Chris Nybo

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22059-105New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback