IL SB3120 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Uniform Electronic Transactions in Health Care Billing Act. Requires all health plan carriers and health care providers to exchange claims and eligibility information electronically using the companion guides, implementation guides, timelines, and standard electronic data interchange transactions for claims submissions, payments, and verification of benefits required under the Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act in order to be compensable by the health plan carrier. Provides that no health plan carrier or health care provider may add to or modify the uniform companion guides. Provides that the Act applies to all health plan carriers. Grants the Director of Insurance the right to investigate complaints filed under the Act. Sets forth criteria for complaints filed under the Act. Requires the Department of Insurance to adopt rules, and allows the Department to establish exemptions to the Act by regulation. Defines terms. Effective immediately.
Title
INS-ELECTRONIC TRANSACTIONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020 |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson |