IL SB3119 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Municipal Retirement Fund (IMRF) Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that a person who participated as a chief of police in a fund under the Downstate Police Article and returns to work in any capacity with the police department, with any oversight of the police department, or in an advisory capacity for the police department with the same municipality with which that pension was earned, regardless of whether he or she is considered an employee of the police department or is eligible for inclusion in the municipality's downstate police fund, is not considered an employee under the IMRF Article. Effective January 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEN CD-IMRF-POLICE CHIEFS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2018-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-30SenateSenate Concurs
2018-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 058-000-000
2018-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-000
2018-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-000-000
2018-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-000-000
2018-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 30, 2018
2018-05-29SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
2018-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2018-05-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-004-000
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Personnel & Pensions Committee; 009-000-000
2018-05-23HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2018-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2018-05-18HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 013-001-000
2018-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Personnel & Pensions Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2018-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2018-05-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2018-04-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-04-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2018-04-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateDo Pass as Amended Licensed Activities and Pensions; 008-000-000
2018-04-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2018-04-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4057-109Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3119&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3119.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3119eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3119enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3119sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3119ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3119ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB3119_04262018_010000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB3119_05282018_007000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB3119ham002_05302018_041001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB3119ham001_05302018_041000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback