IL SB3119 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Municipal Retirement Fund (IMRF) Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that a person who participated as a chief of police in a fund under the Downstate Police Article and returns to work in any capacity with the police department, with any oversight of the police department, or in an advisory capacity for the police department with the same municipality with which that pension was earned, regardless of whether he or she is considered an employee of the police department or is eligible for inclusion in the municipality's downstate police fund, is not considered an employee under the IMRF Article. Effective January 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEN CD-IMRF-POLICE CHIEFS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2018-04-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-04-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2018-04-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateDo Pass as Amended Licensed Activities and Pensions; 008-000-000
2018-04-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2018-04-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4057-109Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback