IL SB3119 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1097
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1097
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Retirement Fund (IMRF) Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that a person who participated as a chief of police in a fund under the Downstate Police Article and returns to work in any capacity with the police department, with any oversight of the police department, or in an advisory capacity for the police department with the same municipality with which that pension was earned, regardless of whether he or she is considered an employee of the police department or is eligible for inclusion in the municipality's downstate police fund, is not considered an employee under the IMRF Article. Effective January 1, 2019.
Title
PEN CD-IMRF-POLICE CHIEFS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-26 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1097 |
2018-08-26 | Senate | Effective Date August 26, 2018 |
2018-08-26 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 058-000-000 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-000 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-000-000 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-000-000 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 30, 2018 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2018-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2018-05-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-004-000 |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Personnel & Pensions Committee; 009-000-000 |
2018-05-23 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2018-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2018-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2018-05-18 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 013-001-000 |
2018-05-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Personnel & Pensions Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-05-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2018-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2018-05-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2018-05-07 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2018-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities and Pensions; 008-000-000 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 7-109 | Amended Code | Citation Text |