IL SB3118 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-12-04 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that any federal firearms licensee, other than a collector of curios and relics, within 72 hours of discovery and knowledge of a missing, lost, or stolen firearm, shall report that information to the Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives and the Department of State Police. Provides that the Department of State Police shall enter the information into a searchable database accessible online to those licensees who are authorized access to the Firearm Transfer Inquiry Program. Upon recovery of a firearm listed in the database, the Department of State Police shall remove the information of the firearm from the database. Provides that a violation is a Class B misdemeanor. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM CD-LOST-STOLEN FIREARMS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-04SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Tim Bivins

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720524-4Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback