IL SB3117 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Alcoholism and Other Drug Abuse and Dependency Act. Requires the Department of Human Services to develop and maintain an online registry for recovery residences that operate in Illinois to serve as a referral resource for individuals seeking continued recovery assistance. Defines "recovery residence" to mean a sober, safe, and healthy living environment that promotes recovery from alcohol and other drug use and associated problems. Encourages non-licensable recovery residences to register with the Department. Provides that the registry shall be publicly available through online posting and shall highlight attributes of the recovery residences and their locations. Provides that registrants are encouraged to seek national accreditation from any entity that has developed uniform national standards for recovery residences. Effective January 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DHS-RECOVERY RESIDENCES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018
2018-03-14SenateDo Pass Human Services; 006-000-000
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Human Services
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Tim Bivins

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2030155-35New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback