IL SB3116 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Nurse Practice Act. In provisions concerning written collaborative agreements, restores the ability of podiatric physicians to collaborate with advanced practice registered nurses. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PODIATRIC PHYSICIAN

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018
2018-04-23SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 23, 2018
2018-04-19SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 012-000-000
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-03-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2256515-20Amended CodeCitation Text
2256565-35.1Amended CodeCitation Text
2256565-40Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback