IL SB3115 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that grant amounts under the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families (TANF) program may not vary on the basis of a TANF recipient's county of residence. Increases TANF grant amounts to: 30% of federal poverty guidelines beginning October 1, 2018; 40% of federal poverty guidelines beginning October 1, 2019; and 50% of federal poverty guidelines beginning October 1, 2020. Provides that beginning October 1, 2021, and each October 1 thereafter, TANF grant amounts shall be annually adjusted to remain equal to 50% of the most recent federal poverty guidelines for each family size. Provides that TANF grants for child-only assistance units shall be at least 75% of TANF grants for assistance units of the same size that consist of a caretaker relative with children. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TANF-GRANT AMOUNT INCREASES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 85 N: 30 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 33 N: 20 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2018-07-01SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b)
2018-05-31SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 011-005-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2018
2018-05-30SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 085-030-001
2018-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 016-000-000
2018-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-05-25HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-05-25HouseFiscal Note Filed
2018-05-23HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-05-21HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-05-21HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 009-007-000
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-25HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-04-25HouseArrived in House
2018-04-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 033-020-000
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-04-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass Human Services; 006-003-000
2018-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-03-14SenatePostponed - Human Services
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Human Services
2018-02-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-02-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
305512-4.11Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback