IL SB3115 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that grant amounts under the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families (TANF) program may not vary on the basis of a TANF recipient's county of residence. Increases TANF grant amounts to: 30% of federal poverty guidelines beginning October 1, 2018; 40% of federal poverty guidelines beginning October 1, 2019; and 50% of federal poverty guidelines beginning October 1, 2020. Provides that beginning October 1, 2021, and each October 1 thereafter, TANF grant amounts shall be annually adjusted to remain equal to 50% of the most recent federal poverty guidelines for each family size. Provides that TANF grants for child-only assistance units shall be at least 75% of TANF grants for assistance units of the same size that consist of a caretaker relative with children. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TANF-GRANT AMOUNT INCREASES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-04-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass Human Services; 006-003-000
2018-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-03-14SenatePostponed - Human Services
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Human Services
2018-02-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-02-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
305512-4.11Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback