IL SB3114 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Authorizes the issuance and renewal of a license to sell alcoholic liquor at premises located within 100 feet of a specific church and school located in the City of Chicago. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LIQUOR-SALE NEAR CHURCH/SCHOOL

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-18HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-08HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-05-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-03HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2018-05-03HouseArrived in House
2018-05-03SenateThird Reading - Passed; 047-000-000
2018-05-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Aquino
2018-05-03SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 012-000-000
2018-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018
2018-04-23SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateDo Pass as Amended Executive; 017-000-000
2018-04-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2018-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
23556-11Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback