IL SB3112 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Children and Family Services Act. In provisions permitting the Department of Children and Family Services to offer and provide family preservation services to any child or family who is the subject of a report of suspected child abuse or neglect and who is likely to be the subject of future reports of suspected child abuse or neglect, provides that if the report is determined to be indicated, the family shall cooperate with and be provided family preservation services as defined in the Abused and Neglected Child Reporting Act. Amends the Abused and Neglected Child Reporting Act. Provides that if a report of child abuse or neglect is determined to be indicated, the child's family shall cooperate with and be provided family preservation services. Requires the Department to develop a service plan for the family's acceptance of services (rather than for the family's voluntary acceptance or refusal). Removes a requirement that the Department explain its lack of legal authority to compel the acceptance of services. Makes changes to the definition of "family preservation services".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DCFS-FAMILY PRESERVATION SRVCS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-09HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-05-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-04-27HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018
2018-04-23SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass Human Services; 009-000-000
2018-03-14SenatePostponed - Human Services
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Human Services
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
205055Amended CodeCitation Text
32558.1Amended CodeCitation Text
32558.2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback