IL SB3109 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Professional Regulation Law. Provides that the Department of Financial and Professional regulation shall allow an applicant to provide his or her individual taxpayer identification number as an alternative to provide a social security number when applying for a license. Provides that no applicant shall be denied a license solely based on his or her immigration status or citizenship status. Further amends the Pharmacy Practice Act. Removes language providing that an applicant for a registered pharmacist license shall provide evidence indicating that he or she is a United States citizen or legally admitted alien.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DFPR LICENSE-IMMIGRATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Motion in House (Y: 61 N: 49 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 9 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-29SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 036-010-000
2018-05-31SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 007-000-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2018
2018-05-30SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-05-30HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 061-049-001
2018-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-05-30HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Standard Debate
2018-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-05-30HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-05-28HouseThird Reading - Consideration Postponed
2018-05-28HousePlaced on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
2018-05-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2018-05-28HouseRemoved from Short Debate Status
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2018-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 012-003-000
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
2018-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2018-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2018-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2018-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-04-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-25HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-04-25HouseArrived in House
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-04-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 039-009-000
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateDo Pass as Amended Licensed Activities and Pensions; 008-000-000
2018-04-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2018-04-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2018-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-03-14SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2018-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2021052105-140New CodeSee Bill Text
2021052105-15Amended CodeCitation Text
225856Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback