IL SB3108 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-4)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0939
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-4)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0939
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Predator Accountability Act. Changes the short title of the Act to the Trafficking Victims Protection Act. Adds references to involuntary servitude and labor trafficking throughout the Act. Provides that a victim of involuntary servitude or labor trafficking has a cause of action against any person or entity who knowingly subjects, attempts to subject, or engages in a conspiracy to subject the victim to involuntary servitude or labor trafficking. Provides that the standard of proof in specified actions under the Act is a preponderance of the evidence. Provides that a legal guardian, family member, agent of the victim, court appointee, certain type of organization, or government entity responsible for enforcing the laws of this State may bring an action on behalf of a victim. Provides that it is not a defense to an action brought under the Act that a defendant has been acquitted or has not been investigated, arrested, prosecuted, or convicted under the Criminal Code of 2012 or has been convicted of a different offense for the conduct that is alleged to give rise to liability under the Act. Makes other changes, including corresponding changes in the Code of Civil Procedure.
Title
TRAFFICKING VICTIMS PROTECTION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-17 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0939 |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Judiciary; 007-000-000 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Judiciary |
2018-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2018 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2018-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2018-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2018-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-05-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-05-23 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2018-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2018-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-05-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-05-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-05-02 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-04-24 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-04-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 047-000-000 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 007-000-000 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
735 | 5 | 13-225 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 128 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 128 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 128 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 128 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 128 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 128 | 45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 128 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |