IL SB3108 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Predator Accountability Act. Changes the short title of the Act to the Trafficking Victims Protection Act. Adds references to involuntary servitude and labor trafficking throughout the Act. Provides that a victim of involuntary servitude or labor trafficking has a cause of action against any person or entity who knowingly subjects, attempts to subject, or engages in a conspiracy to subject the victim to involuntary servitude or labor trafficking. Provides that the standard of proof in specified actions under the Act is a preponderance of the evidence. Provides that a legal guardian, family member, agent of the victim, court appointee, certain type of organization, or government entity responsible for enforcing the laws of this State may bring an action on behalf of a victim. Provides that it is not a defense to an action brought under the Act that a defendant has been acquitted or has not been investigated, arrested, prosecuted, or convicted under the Criminal Code of 2012 or has been convicted of a different offense for the conduct that is alleged to give rise to liability under the Act. Makes other changes, including corresponding changes in the Code of Civil Procedure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TRAFFICKING VICTIMS PROTECTION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000
2018-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2018-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-05-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-05-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-05-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000
2018-05-02HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-04-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-04-24HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-04-24HouseArrived in House
2018-04-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 047-000-000
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 007-000-000
2018-03-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-03-05SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
735513-225Amended CodeCitation Text
7401281Amended CodeCitation Text
74012810Amended CodeCitation Text
74012815Amended CodeCitation Text
74012820Amended CodeCitation Text
74012825Amended CodeCitation Text
74012845Amended CodeCitation Text
7401285Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback