IL SB3107 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-09-04 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Transportation Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of Transportation is authorized to enter into agreements with any state, state agency, or units of local government or political subdivisions (along with other entities). Provides that the Department shall have the power to freely lease or otherwise contract for any purpose any of the locomotives, passenger railcars, and other rolling stock equipment or accessions to any state or state agency, public or private entity, or quasi-public entity. Provides that the Department shall have the power to otherwise enter any contracts or agreements necessary or convenient to provide rail services, operate or maintain locomotives, passenger railcars, and other rolling stock equipment or accessions. Provides that when the Department enters into an agreement for either the payment of railroad requirement maintenance expenses necessary for intercity passenger service or for the lease or use of locomotives, passenger railcars, and other rolling stock equipment or accessions, the Department may deposit funds, use fees, or rental payments into any escrow account. Provides that the funds in any required maintenance escrow account may be withdrawn by the carrier or entity in control of the railroad being maintained. Provides that funds in an escrow account holding lease, use fees, or rental payments may be withdrawn by the Department to be used for various purposes. Creates the High-Speed Rail Rolling Stock Fund to deposit the remaining balance of an escrow account at the end of the account's term. Provides that the High-Speed Rail Rolling Stock Fund may be used for any purpose related to locomotives, passenger railcars, and other rolling stock equipment. Makes a corresponding change in the State Finance Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

IDOT-INTERCITY RAIL SERVICES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-04SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2018-04-27SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass Transportation; 011-000-000
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Transportation
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2027052705-440Amended CodeCitation Text
20270549.25hAmended CodeCitation Text
301055.886New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback