IL SB3106 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Governmental Ethics Act. Provides that, for purposes of determining the partisanship of any person who is appointed by the Governor to an office that either requires specific partisanship or limits the number of appointees from a single political party that may be appointed, the vote of that person in the 3 general primary elections immediately preceding the effective date of the appointment shall determine his or her partisanship for that person's term of office. Provides that a person who did not vote, or who voted but did not request a partisan ballot, in the 3 general primary elections immediately preceding the effective date of the appointment or who voted but requested partisan ballots for 2 or more different political parties in the 3 general primary elections immediately preceding the effective date of the appointment shall be deemed an independent for purposes of determining partisanship for that person's term of office.
Title
ETHICS-PARTISAN APPOINTEES
Sponsors
Sen. Jil Tracy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-26 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2024-05-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 26, 2024 |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2024 |
2024-05-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 24, 2024 |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 17, 2024 |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Government Operations |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 420 | 3A-40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3106&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB3106.htm |