IL SB3106 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 28 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-28 - Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Comptroller Act. Provides that the Business Enterprise Council created under the Business Enterprise for Minorities, Women, and Persons with Disabilities Act shall provide the Comptroller with information necessary to fulfill the Comptroller's responsibilities with respect to the Minority Contractor Opportunity Initiative. Provides that the Comptroller shall annually prepare and submit a report to the Governor and the General Assembly concerning the progress of the initiative for the preceding fiscal year (rather than calendar year). Provides that each Chief Procurement Officer shall provide to the Comptroller information necessary to fulfill the Comptroller's responsibilities with respect to the Minority Contractor Opportunity Initiative. Makes a conforming changes. Amends the Business Enterprise for Minorities, Women, and Persons with Disabilities Act. Adds the State Comptroller to the Business Enterprise Council for Minorities, Women, and Persons with Disabilities. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COMPTRLLER-MINORITY CONTRACTOR

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-05-28SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-04-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-04-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-04-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2018-04-27HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-04-27HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-27HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 050-000-000
2018-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Hutchinson
2018-04-26SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 006-000-000
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Postponed - State Government
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 26, 2018
2018-04-25SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to State Government
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to State Government
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-04-12SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateDo Pass as Amended State Government; 008-000-000
2018-04-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government
2018-04-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - State Government
2018-04-04SenatePostponed - State Government
2018-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-03-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2018-03-02SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to State Government
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1540523.9Amended CodeCitation Text
305755Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback