IL SB3106 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0801
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0801
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Comptroller Act. Provides that the Business Enterprise Council created under the Business Enterprise for Minorities, Women, and Persons with Disabilities Act shall provide the Comptroller with information necessary to fulfill the Comptroller's responsibilities with respect to the Minority Contractor Opportunity Initiative. Provides that the Comptroller shall annually prepare and submit a report to the Governor and the General Assembly concerning the progress of the initiative for the preceding fiscal year (rather than calendar year). Provides that each Chief Procurement Officer shall provide to the Comptroller information necessary to fulfill the Comptroller's responsibilities with respect to the Minority Contractor Opportunity Initiative. Makes a conforming changes. Amends the Business Enterprise for Minorities, Women, and Persons with Disabilities Act. Adds the State Comptroller to the Business Enterprise Council for Minorities, Women, and Persons with Disabilities. Effective immediately.
Title
COMPTRLLER-MINORITY CONTRACTOR
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0801 |
2018-08-10 | Senate | Effective Date August 10, 2018 |
2018-08-10 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-05-28 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2018-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000 |
2018-05-07 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2018-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-000 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Hutchinson |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 006-000-000 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Postponed - State Government |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 26, 2018 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended State Government; 008-000-000 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - State Government |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 405 | 23.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 575 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |