IL SB3105 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-8)
Status: Passed on July 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0625
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-8)
Status: Passed on July 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0625
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Abused and Neglected Child Reporting Act. Provides that law enforcement officers, in an effort to assist the Department of Children and Family Services in child protective investigations in its response to reports of child abuse or neglect, must, upon request of a child protection investigator, accompany the child protection investigator. Provides that it is the responsibility of the accompanying officer to accompany the child protection investigator to any other police jurisdiction that is outside the accompanying officer's primary jurisdiction. Amends the Department of State Police Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois, the Counties Code, and the Illinois Municipal Code making conforming changes.
Title
DCFS-LAW ENFORCEMENT ASSIST
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-20 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0625 |
2018-07-20 | Senate | Effective Date July 20, 2018 |
2018-07-20 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-28 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-05-28 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-18 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2018-05-07 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2018-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2018-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Human Services; 007-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Tim Bivins |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Tim Bivins |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2605 | 2605-433 | New Code | See Bill Text |
325 | 5 | 7.4b | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 5 | 3-6015.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 11-1-2.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |