IL SB3105 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Illinois Family Care Provider Act. Provides that an employer must provide up to 12 weeks of unpaid family medical leave to an employee during any 12-month period in connection with one or more of the following: (i) the birth or adoption of a grandchild, in order for the employee to care for such grandchild; (ii) the placement of a grandchild with the employee for adoption or foster care; or (iii) a serious health condition of a grandchild, in order for the employee to care for such grandchild, or a serious health condition of a grandparent, in order for the employee to care for such grandparent. Contains provisions concerning employee benefits and prohibited acts. Authorizes an employee to file a civil action for enforcement. Effective immediately.
Title
EMPLOYMT-GRNDPARNT FAMLY LEAVE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 11, 2014 |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Postponed - Labor and Commerce |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Postponed - Labor and Commerce |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Assigned to Labor and Commerce |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3105&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB3105.htm |