IL SB3104 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-5)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that public indecency also includes committing the proscribed acts while confined in a penal institution. Provides that a person convicted of a second or subsequent violation for public indecency while confined in a penal institution is guilty of a Class 4 felony. Amends the Sex Offender Registration Act. Includes in the definition of "sex offense", a second violation or attempted violation of public indecency while confined in a penal institution committed on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act. Amends the County Jail Good Behavior Allowance Act. Provides that if an inmate while in custody of the warden is convicted of public indecency, his or her day for day good behavior allowance shall be revoked for each day the allowance was earned while the inmate was in custody of the warden. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PUBLIC INDECENCY-PENAL INSTIT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-05-23HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-05-23HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-05-23HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-05-22HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2018-05-18HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-17HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2018-04-25HouseArrived in House
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-04-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-001
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018
2018-04-24SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2018-04-24SenateDo Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 010-000-000
2018-04-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-24SenateReported Back To Criminal Law; 003-000-000
2018-04-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Reported Back To Criminal Law
2018-04-23SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance
2018-04-23SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2018-04-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-02-27SenateTo Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720511-30Amended CodeCitation Text
720511-9Amended CodeCitation Text
7301303.1Amended CodeCitation Text
7301502Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback