IL SB3103 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1004
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1004
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Parks Act. Specifies that certain actions are not violations of the Act if they are done with the approval of the Department of Natural Resources. Effective immediately.
Title
STATE PARKS-DNR APPROVAL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1004 |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Effective Date May 27, 2022 |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-03-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2022-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 008-000-000 |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2022-02-22 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dave Vella |
2022-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-17 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2022-02-16 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 15, 2022 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 8, 2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Do Pass Agriculture; 013-000-000 |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 835 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |