IL SB3103 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Failed on November 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Total Veto Stands
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Failed on November 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Total Veto Stands
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Immigrant Tenant Protection Act. Defines terms. Provides that, with exceptions, a landlord shall not require disclosure of, disclose, intimidate, harass, or evict a tenant on the basis of a person's immigration or citizenship status. Provides that an oral or written warning notice or explanation, given in good faith, regarding the applicable rental agreement, rules, regulations, lease, or law is not a violation of the Act. Provides that the Act does not enlarge or diminish a landlord's right to terminate a tenancy pursuant to existing State or local law; nor does the Act enlarge or diminish any ability of local government to regulate or enforce a prohibition against a landlord's harassment of a tenant. Provides that waiver of a right under the Act by a tenant, occupant, or person known to the landlord to be associated with a tenant or occupant is void as a matter of public policy. Provides remedies. Provides that an action for injunctive relief may be brought by a nonprofit organization. Provides that in a civil action involving a tenant's or occupant's housing rights, no inquiry shall be permitted into the tenant's or occupant's immigration or citizenship status, with exceptions. Contains a severability clause. Amends the Eviction Article of the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that it is an affirmative defense to an eviction that a landlord engaged in conduct prohibited under the Immigrant Tenant Protection Act. Amends the Mobile Home Landlord and Tenant Rights Act. Provides that an eviction order may not be entered against a tenant as a reprisal for a tenant's efforts to secure remedies under the Immigrant Tenant Protection Act. Effective immediately.
Title
IMMIGRANT TENANT PROTECTION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 62 N: 48 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 33 N: 18 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 62 N: 48 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 33 N: 18 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-28 | Senate | Total Veto Stands |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Placed Calendar Total Veto November 14, 2018 |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Governor Vetoed |
2018-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 032-014-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2018 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 062-048-001 |
2018-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 008-003-000 |
2018-05-23 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2018-05-23 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 002-001-000 |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2018-05-22 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. André Thapedi |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-05-17 | House | To Real & Personal Property Law Subcommittee |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2018-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-05-14 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2018-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2018-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2018-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2018-05-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-10 | House | First Reading |
2018-05-09 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-05-09 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 033-018-000 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Castro |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Withdrawn by Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 007-003-000 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 2, 2018 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 007-004-000 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
735 | 5 | 9-106.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
765 | 745 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |