IL SB3102 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - January 7, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Provides that it is an unlawful practice to offer to consumers at retail a rebate made on a stored-value card that charges dormancy fees or other post-issuance fees. Defines terms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONS FRAUD REBATE STORED VALUE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-11-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 35 N: 17 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - January 7, 2019
2018-11-28SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2018-11-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-001-000
2018-11-28House3/5 Vote Required
2018-11-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-11-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Mental Health Committee; 013-000-000
2018-11-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Mental Health Committee
2018-11-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-11-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-11-26HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-26HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-11-13HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-29HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-29HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-18HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-18HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 035-017-000
2018-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Castro
2018-04-26SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Commerce and Economic Development; 009-001-000
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 26, 2018
2018-04-25SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2018-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Commerce and Economic Development
2018-04-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Commerce and Economic Development
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateDo Pass Commerce and Economic Development; 009-001-000
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-04-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-04-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Commerce and Economic Development
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8155052LLLAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback