IL SB3101 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - House Floor Amendment No. 6 Rules Refers to Environment
Pending: House Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Contains provisions requiring the Environmental Protection Agency to create a State beneficiary mitigation plan in accordance with specified consent decrees. Provides that the Agency shall establish the Volkswagen Settlement Task Force. Contains provisions concerning the membership of the Task Force. Provides that the Task Force shall conduct listening sessions, review the requirements of a specified trust agreement, evaluate public comments, and prepare a report of its recommendations for use of the funds received by the State from the trust agreement. Provides that the Task Force shall submit the report to the Governor and the General Assembly by no later than January 1, 2019. Provides that based on information provided by the Task Force, a public comment period, and other specified considerations, the Agency shall create a draft and final version of the State plan. Provides that within 30 days of the effective date, the Environmental Protection Agency shall create a page on its website that provides the public with specified information relating to the specified consent decrees. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EPA-VOLKSWAGEN SETTLEMENT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 31 N: 21 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 6 Rules Refers to Environment
2018-11-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 6 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-11-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 6 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Sente
2018-11-27HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-27HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-27HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 5 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-11-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 4 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-11-27HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Environment; 016-000-000
2018-11-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 5 Rules Refers to Environment
2018-11-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Environment
2018-11-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 5 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-11-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 5 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Sente
2018-11-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-11-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Sente
2018-11-26HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carol Sente
2018-11-20HouseAssigned to Environment
2018-05-31HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-31HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-31HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Environment
2018-05-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-05-18HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-05-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Environment
2018-05-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Environment
2018-05-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-05-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Environment
2018-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 031-021-000
2018-04-26SenateVerified
2018-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Castro
2018-04-26SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Environment and Conservation; 005-002-000
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 26, 2018
2018-04-25SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateDo Pass Environment and Conservation; 006-000-000
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Environment and Conservation
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
415552.3-15New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3101&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3101.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3101eng.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3101sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3101ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3101ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3101ham003.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3101ham004.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3101ham005.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3101ham006.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB3101_04262018_003000T.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback