IL SB3100 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-7)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Equal Pay Act of 2003. Prohibits an employer from requiring an employee to sign a nondisclosure agreement regarding the employee's salary, from seeking the salary history of a prospective employee, and from requiring that a prospective employee's salary history meet any specified criteria. Provides for employers to establish a self-evaluation plan of the employer's pay practices. Sets forth permissible components of a self-evaluation plan. Requires the self-evaluation plan to be submitted to the Department of Labor for verification. Provides that an employer that has completed a self-evaluation plan that has been verified by the Department of Labor has an affirmative defense to liability for certain alleged violations of the Act. Provides that an employer that does not have a verified self-evaluation plan may be subject to civil penalties for violations of the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EQUAL PAY-SALARY HISTORY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2018-05-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
2018-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 30, 2018
2018-05-29SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2018-05-29SenateDo Pass as Amended Labor; 013-001-002
2018-05-28SenateWaive Posting Notice
2018-05-23SenatePostponed - Labor
2018-05-23SenateDo Pass as Amended Labor; 007-005-006
2018-05-23SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-05-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor
2018-05-21SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-21SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2018-05-15SenateRe-assigned to Labor
2018-05-15SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-09SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-04-10SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Rooney
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Labor
2018-02-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-02-22SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
82011210Amended CodeCitation Text
82011213New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback