IL SB3095 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Weather Modification Act. Provides that any form of weather modification shall not be allowed in the State, including the seeding of clouds by plane or ground. Defines "seeding" as a type of weather modification that aims to change the amount or type of precipitation that falls from clouds. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

WEATHER MODIFICATION-SEEDING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2025-01-07SenateSession Sine Die
2024-03-15SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2024-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2024-03-14SenatePostponed - Executive
2024-03-12SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1), this committee amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2024-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2024-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson
2024-02-21SenatePostponed - Executive
2024-02-14SenateAssigned to Executive
2024-02-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2024-02-02SenateFirst Reading
2024-02-02SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback