IL SB3095 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-30 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-30 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that if a person is convicted of aggravated driving under the influence on the basis of being involved in an accident that proximately caused the death of a parent or parents of a child or children, the person shall be ordered by the court to pay child support to the child or children. Includes provisions governing the amount and duration of the support obligation, enforcement, and collection.
Title
DUI-CHILD SUPPORT-RESTITUTION
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-30 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1), the following amendments will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As February 25, 2022 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John Connor |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1), the following amendments will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As February 18, 2022 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John Connor |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John Connor |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 11-501 | Amended Code | Citation Text |