IL SB3093 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1077
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Property Tax Code. Makes changes concerning the maximum reduction under the general homestead exemption for life care facilities. Provides that those changes are declarative of existing law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROP TX-HOMESTEAD-LIFE CARE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-24SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1077
2018-08-24SenateEffective Date January 1, 2019
2018-08-24SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-26SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-28SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-001-001
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2018-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Anderson
2018-04-26SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 005-000-000
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateDo Pass as Amended Revenue; 008-000-000
2018-04-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2018-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-03-01SenatePostponed - Revenue
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Revenue
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3520015-175Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback