IL SB3091 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Tabled By Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Tabled By Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Removes the permit requirement, from September 1 through December 31, for a vehicle transporting agricultural commodities to exceed the maximum weight, axle weight, and gross weight limits under certain circumstances. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
VEH CD-PERMITS-EXCESS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Tabled By Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2020-03-04 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (TR) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 15-301 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3091&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB3091.htm |