IL SB3085 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $2,100,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the Illinois Public Health Association for the distribution of pre-exposure prophylaxis information. Effective July 1, 2020.
Title
$PUBLIC HEALTH ASSOCIATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations I |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3085&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/PDF/10100SB3085.pdf |