IL SB3081 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Housing Authorities Act. Requires each Housing Authority to provide, upon request by the State, a list of all applicants waiting for admission to any public housing or housing project operated by the Housing Authority, including information on each applicant's position on the waiting list.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PUBLIC HOUSING-WAITING LIST

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2018-05-18HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-17HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-05-17HouseSubstitute House Sponsorship Request Accepted No Action Taken by Rules
2018-05-09HouseSubstitute House Sponsorship Request Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-09HouseSubstitute House Sponsorship Request Filed Pursuant Rule 37(c) - Sen. Laura Murphy
2018-05-02HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-04-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-24HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury
2018-04-24HouseArrived in House
2018-04-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 047-000-000
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateDo Pass as Amended State Government; 007-000-000
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-04-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
2018-04-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-04-04SenatePostponed - State Government
2018-03-01SenatePostponed - State Government
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to State Government
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3101025.06New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback