IL SB3081 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Housing Authorities Act. Requires each Housing Authority to provide, upon request by the State, a list of all applicants waiting for admission to any public housing or housing project operated by the Housing Authority, including information on each applicant's position on the waiting list.
Title
PUBLIC HOUSING-WAITING LIST
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-21 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1021 |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2018-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-001-000 |
2018-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-05-18 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018 |
2018-05-17 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-05-17 | House | Substitute House Sponsorship Request Accepted No Action Taken by Rules |
2018-05-09 | House | Substitute House Sponsorship Request Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-09 | House | Substitute House Sponsorship Request Filed Pursuant Rule 37(c) - Sen. Laura Murphy |
2018-05-02 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-24 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury |
2018-04-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 047-000-000 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended State Government; 007-000-000 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |