IL SB3080 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity shall by rule establish a comprehensive low-income water assistance policy and program. Contains various provisions concerning the policy and program. Amends the Public Utilities Act. Adds requirements related to billing statements and reconnection of service for water and sewer utilities. Provides that upon request by a water utility, the Illinois Commerce Commission may allow, but may not require, a water utility to establish a customer assistance program. Provides that an entity subject to certain federal laws that serves or provides water or sewer services to a specified number of people shall conduct a cost of service study every 5 years. Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Provides that within one year of the effective date of the amendatory Act, every community water system shall create a plan to remove all known lead service lines within 10 years from the completion of the plan. Requires each community water system to implement an asset management plan designed to inspect, maintain, repair, and renew its infrastructure within 18 months of the effective date of the amendatory Act. Requires the Department of Public Health to adopt rules for lead replacement that require an expedited timeline for high risk facilities and communities within 18 months of the effective date of the amendatory Act. Creates the Statewide Advisory Council on Lead in Drinking Water and requires specified community water supplies to create water system advisory councils tasked with various duties related to lead in drinking water awareness. Makes other changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DCEO-UTILITIES-IDPH-EPA-WATER

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2018-05-11SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018
2018-05-08SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-08SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 26, 2018
2018-04-25SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Public Health
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-04-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2018-04-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-03-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018
2018-03-14SenateDo Pass Public Health; 008-001-000
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-02-27SenatePostponed - Public Health
2018-02-22SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Public Health
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-02-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-02-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20605605-870New CodeSee Bill Text
22058-306Amended CodeCitation Text
415517.11Amended CodeCitation Text
415517.12New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback