IL SB3080 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-05 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0751
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-05 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0751
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. In a provision concerning network adequacy for managed care organizations (MCO) contracted with the Department of Healthcare and Family Services, provides that each MCO shall (i) on a monthly basis, jointly validate with contracted providers any changes in provider information, including, but not limited to, changes concerning new providers, terminated providers, updated address information, hours of operation, or other information that is material to a Medicaid beneficiary in the enrollment and provider selection process; and (ii) be required to produce system reports that validate that all MCO systems reflect updated provider information. Provides that in situations in which an enrolled Medicaid provider renders services based on information obtained after verifying a patient's eligibility and coverage plan through either the Department's current enrollment system or the coverage plan identified by the patient presenting for services, such services shall be considered rendered in good faith. Requires the Department to create and maintain a MCO Performance Metrics Comparison Tool that provides periodic reporting, on at least a quarterly basis, of each MCO's performance in various administrative measures. Requires the tool to be accessible in both a print and online format, with the online format allowing for Medicaid beneficiaries and providers to access additional detailed MCO performance information. Effective immediately.
Title
DHFS-MCO PERFORMANCE METRICS
Sponsors
Sen. Donne Trotter [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. William Delgado [D] |
Rep. Gregory Harris [D] | Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] | Rep. Eddie Jackson [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-05 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0751 |
2016-08-05 | Senate | Effective Date August 5, 2016 |
2016-08-05 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2016-05-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-001-000 |
2016-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 013-000-000 |
2016-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2016-05-17 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2016 |
2016-05-17 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2016-05-17 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Gregory Harris |
2016-05-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-16 | House | First Reading |
2016-05-13 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2016-05-13 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Trotter |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 007-000-000 |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 13, 2016 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2016 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 18, 2016 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Do Pass Special Committee on Oversight of Medicaid Managed Care; 009-000-000 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 22, 2016 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to Special Committee on Oversight of Medicaid Managed Care |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-30.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |