IL SB3079 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Election Code. Includes in the definition of "electioneering communication", a digital communication and provides that the definition includes any communication that is placed or promoted on an online platform. Provides that an online platform shall maintain and make available for online public inspection in machine readable format, a complete record of any request to purchase on the online platform an electioneering communication that is made by a person whose aggregate requests to purchase electioneering communications on the online platform during the calendar year exceed $500. Provides that the record shall be made available as soon as is possible and shall be retained by the online platform for a period of not less than 4 years. Provides that any person who requests to purchase an electioneering communication on an online platform shall provide the online platform with the information necessary for the online platform to comply with the record requirements. Defines "online platform". In provisions concerning disclosures in political communications, provides that political committee that pays for specified political communication must be identified conspicuously within the communication. Provides that a communication does not make a statement in a clear and conspicuous manner if it is difficult to read or hear or if the placement is easily overlooked. Provides that each provider of electioneering communications shall make reasonable efforts to ensure that electioneering communications are not purchased by a foreign national, directly or indirectly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DIGITAL ELECTION COMMUNICATION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-11SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018
2018-05-08SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-08SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 011-005-000
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateDo Pass Executive; 010-004-000
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1059-1.14Amended CodeCitation Text
1059-1.5aNew CodeSee Bill Text
1059-10.5New CodeSee Bill Text
1059-9.5Amended CodeCitation Text
1059-9.6New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback