IL SB3079 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Includes in the definition of "electioneering communication", a digital communication and provides that the definition includes any communication that is placed or promoted on an online platform. Provides that an online platform shall maintain and make available for online public inspection in machine readable format, a complete record of any request to purchase on the online platform an electioneering communication that is made by a person whose aggregate requests to purchase electioneering communications on the online platform during the calendar year exceed $500. Provides that the record shall be made available as soon as is possible and shall be retained by the online platform for a period of not less than 4 years. Provides that any person who requests to purchase an electioneering communication on an online platform shall provide the online platform with the information necessary for the online platform to comply with the record requirements. Defines "online platform". In provisions concerning disclosures in political communications, provides that political committee that pays for specified political communication must be identified conspicuously within the communication. Provides that a communication does not make a statement in a clear and conspicuous manner if it is difficult to read or hear or if the placement is easily overlooked. Provides that each provider of electioneering communications shall make reasonable efforts to ensure that electioneering communications are not purchased by a foreign national, directly or indirectly.
Title
DIGITAL ELECTION COMMUNICATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-01-04 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 011-005-000 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 010-004-000 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 9-1.14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 9-1.5a | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 9-10.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 9-9.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 9-9.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |