IL SB3078 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
Pending: Senate Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Animal Welfare Act. Provides that a pet shop operator may offer for sale a dog or cat only if the dog or cat is obtained from an animal control facility or animal shelter. Provides that an animal control facility or animal shelter that supplies dogs or cats to pet shop operators to be offered for sale shall not be a dog breeder or a cat breeder or obtain dogs or cats from a dog breeder, a cat breeder, a person who resells dogs or cats from a breeder, or a person who sells dogs or cats at auction in exchange for payment or compensation. Defines the term "offer for sale" and modifies the definitions of "pet shop operator" and "animal shelter". Effective 180 days after becoming law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ANIMAL WELFARE-PET SHOPS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2020-03-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Commerce and Economic Development
2020-03-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2020-03-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro
2020-02-20SenatePostponed - Commerce and Economic Development
2020-02-14SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2020-02-11SenateAssigned to Commerce and Economic Development
2020-02-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2020-02-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2020-02-06SenateFirst Reading
2020-02-06SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2256052Amended CodeCitation Text
22560520Amended CodeCitation Text
22560520.5Amended CodeCitation Text
2256053.15Amended CodeCitation Text
2256053.8Amended CodeCitation Text
2256053.9New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback