IL SB3076 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Administrative Act. Provides that as the Department of Human Services establishes reimbursement rates that build toward livable wages for front-line personnel in programs serving persons with intellectual and developmental disabilities, the Department shall include rates for therapeutic schools and other programs serving children with intellectual and developmental disabilities. Defines "front-line personnel". Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MHDDAA-FRONT-LINE PERSONNEL

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass Human Services; 008-000-001
2018-03-14SenatePostponed - Human Services
2018-02-27SenatePostponed - Human Services
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Human Services
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Wm. Sam McCann

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2017057.2aNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback