IL SB3075 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-7)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1075
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Administrative Act. Provides that beginning July 1, 2018, and quarterly thereafter, the Department of Human Services shall submit to the General Assembly a written report providing, at minimum, for each State-operated mental health center and State-operated developmental center: (1) the number of employees; (2) the number of patient or resident initiated workplace violence incidents which occurred, including the number which were a direct assault on staff and the number which were a violent incident to which staff responded; (3) the number of employees impacted in each incident; and (4) the rate of workplace violence that quarter expressed as total number of employees impacted to total number of employees. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MHDDAA-REPORTS-STATE-MENT&DEV

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-24SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1075
2018-08-24SenateEffective Date January 1, 2019
2018-08-24SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-30SenateSenate Concurs
2018-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 054-000-000
2018-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Human Services; 006-000-000
2018-05-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Human Services
2018-05-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 29, 2018
2018-05-25SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-05-17HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-05-17HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-05-17HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2018-05-17HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-05-17HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-05-16HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
2018-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2018-05-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-05-02HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2018-04-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-24HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-04-24HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-04-24HouseArrived in House
2018-04-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 045-000-000
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-04-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2018-04-17SenateDo Pass as Amended Human Services; 009-000-000
2018-04-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-04-11SenatePostponed - Human Services
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Human Services
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Human Services
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2018-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2018-04-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-03-14SenatePostponed - Human Services
2018-02-27SenatePostponed - Human Services
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Human Services
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2017054.4New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3075&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3075.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3075eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3075enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-1075.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3075sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3075sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3075ham001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB3075_04232018_025000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB3075_05252018_044000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB3075ham001_05302018_040000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback