IL SB3072 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0845
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0845
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Fair Act. Provides that up to 15 (rather than 20) persons may be appointed by the Governor to the Board of State Fair Advisors. Provides that initial appointments made after the effective date of bill shall be for terms of one, 2, and 3 years staggered to provide for the selection of 5 members each year. Provides that all subsequent appointments shall be for terms of 3 years. Provides that all terms shall commence on the 3rd Monday in January. Provides that members may not serve more than 2 consecutive 3-year terms or a total of 8 consecutive years if the member's initial appointment is less than a 3-year term. Provides that a former member may return to the Board if he or she has not been a member for at least one year prior to reappointment. Makes other technical changes. Effective January 1, 2019.
Title
BOARD STATE FAIR ADVISORS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-14 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0845 |
2018-08-14 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-14 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 056-000-000 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 005-000-000 |
2018-05-24 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government |
2018-05-23 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-23 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 23, 2018 |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 097-002-000 |
2018-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2018-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-08 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 015-000-000 |
2018-05-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Agriculture & Conservation Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-05-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2018-05-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Terri Bryant |
2018-04-26 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2018-04-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-19 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-18 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2018-04-18 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 006-000-000 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Paul Schimpf |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 210 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |