IL SB3070 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-02-25 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person also commits aggravated battery when, in committing a battery, other than by the discharge of a firearm, he or she: (1) knowingly causes great bodily harm or permanent disability or disfigurement to an individual whom the person knows to be a Department of Children and Family Services employee; and (2) is, at the time of the commission of the offense, 21 years of age or older and causes great bodily harm or permanent disability or disfigurement to an individual whom the person knows to be a Department of Children and Family Services employee: (i) performing his or her official duties; (ii) battered to prevent performance of his or her official duties; or (iii) battered in retaliation for performing his or her official duties. Provides that "Department of Children and Family Services employee" includes any Department employee or a worker, case worker, or investigator employed by an agency or organization providing social work, case work, or investigative services under a contract with or a grant from the Department of Children and Family Services. Provides that a violation is a Class 2 felony. Provides that if the battery causes great bodily harm or permanent disability or disfigurement to the employee, the penalty is a Class 1 felony. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AGG BATTERY-DCFS EMPLOYEE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-25SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2022-02-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 25, 2022
2022-02-24SenateSecond Reading
2022-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant
2022-02-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 10, 2022
2022-02-09SenateDo Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 008-000-000
2022-02-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2022-02-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
2022-02-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2022-02-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2022-02-07SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2022-01-31SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2022-01-31SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Doris Turner
2022-01-26SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2022-01-19SenateChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2022-01-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2022-01-14SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2022-01-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
2022-01-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2022-01-11SenateFirst Reading
2022-01-11SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Doris Turner
2022-01-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2022-01-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2022-01-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720512-3.05Amended CodeCitation Text
720512-4Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback