IL SB3069 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1000
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1000
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that an association may, on behalf of all or several of the owners that constitute the association, file an appeal to the Property Tax Appeal Board or intervene in an appeal filed by a taxing body. Defines "association" as: (1) a common interest community association; (2) a unit owners' association; or (3) a master association.
Title
PROP TX-HOMEOWNER ASSOCIATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1000 |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2023 |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2022-04-08 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-001 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Judiciary; 006-000-001 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Judiciary |
2022-04-04 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2022-04-04 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - March 31, 2022 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2022-03-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2022-03-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-28 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-24 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 018-000-000 |
2022-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote |
2022-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2022-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Margaret Croke |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-23 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2022-02-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 23, 2022 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 17, 2022 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 007-000-001 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Reported Back To Judiciary; 002-000-001 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As February 18, 2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | To Judiciary- Property Law |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 16-160 | Amended Code | Citation Text |