IL SB3067 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Election Code. Authorizes election authorities to conduct risk-limiting audits before and after the certification of election results. Provides that the determination to conduct a risk-limiting audit, the scope of an audit, and the uses of the results of an audit are entirely within the discretion of the election authority. Requires the State Board of Elections to adopt rules for the creation of a certification process for certifying that the procedure to be used by an election authority comports with the specified requirements. Provides for waiver of the certification process. Defines "risk-limiting audit". Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ELEC CD-RISK-LIMITING AUDIT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-03-01SenateTo Subcommittee on Election Law
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10522-19New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback