IL SB3065 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Public Utilities Act. Removes language providing that if there is no vacancy on the Illinois Commerce Commission, 4 members of the Commission shall constitute a quorum to transact business. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

UTILITIES-ICC QUORUM

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-09SenateSession Sine Die
2018-04-13SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-12SenatePostponed - Energy and Public Utilities
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Energy and Public Utilities
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22052-101Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback