IL SB3060 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Credit Union Act, the Currency Exchange Act, the Transmitters of Money Act, the Sales Finance Agency Act, the Debt Management Service Act, the Title Insurance Act, the Debt Settlement Consumer Protection Act, the Payday Loan Reform Act, and the Consumer Installment Loan Act. Defines "email address of record". Eliminates references to "certified mail". Provides that a chartered institution, licensee, or applicant shall provide the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation with an accurate and up-to-date email address. Permits the Department to send official notices to the chartered institution, licensee, or applicant's email address of record. Provides that service to the email address of record is completed when sent. Provides that service by mail is completed when the notice is deposited in the U.S. Mail. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FINANCIAL INSTITUTIONS-EMAIL

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-02HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-04-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-24HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2018-04-24HouseArrived in House
2018-04-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 046-000-000
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass as Amended Financial Institutions; 005-000-000
2018-04-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Financial Institutions
2018-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Financial Institutions
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2053051.1Amended CodeCitation Text
2053052Amended CodeCitation Text
20530521Amended CodeCitation Text
20530561Amended CodeCitation Text
2054051Amended CodeCitation Text
20540510Amended CodeCitation Text
20540529.5Amended CodeCitation Text
2054054Amended CodeCitation Text
20565725Amended CodeCitation Text
20565740Amended CodeCitation Text
2056575Amended CodeCitation Text
20565780Amended CodeCitation Text
20565790Amended CodeCitation Text
20566010Amended CodeCitation Text
20566016.5Amended CodeCitation Text
2056602Amended CodeCitation Text
2056606Amended CodeCitation Text
20566510Amended CodeCitation Text
2056652Amended CodeCitation Text
20566520Amended CodeCitation Text
2056654Amended CodeCitation Text
2056656Amended CodeCitation Text
2056700.5New CodeSee Bill Text
2056702Amended CodeCitation Text
20567020.5Amended CodeCitation Text
2056708Amended CodeCitation Text
2056709Amended CodeCitation Text
21515521Amended CodeCitation Text
21515521.1Amended CodeCitation Text
21515521.2Amended CodeCitation Text
2151553Amended CodeCitation Text
22542910Amended CodeCitation Text
22542920Amended CodeCitation Text
22542930Amended CodeCitation Text
22542950Amended CodeCitation Text
22542995Amended CodeCitation Text
8151221-10Amended CodeCitation Text
8151223-5Amended CodeCitation Text
8151224-10Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback