IL SB3055 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Provides that the Environmental Protection Agency shall administer the moneys available to the State under a specified environmental mitigation trust agreement for states. Provides that the Agency may allocate administrative costs to specified eligible mitigation actions. Provides that a Beneficiary Mitigation Plan submitted by the State under the specified environmental trust agreement shall comply with these provisions. Provides that a Beneficiary Mitigation Plan filed within 60 days after the effective date of the amendatory Act shall be revised to comply with the amendatory Act and resubmitted in accordance with the specified environmental mitigation trust agreement. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ENVIRONMENTAL MITIGATION TRUST

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Environment and Conservation
2018-02-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
415552.3-15New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback